Global Patent Index - EP 2028323 A2

EP 2028323 A2 2009-02-25 - Actuation plate for built-in cisterns

Title (en)

Actuation plate for built-in cisterns

Title (de)

Betätigungsplatte für Wandeinbauspülkasten

Title (fr)

Plaque d'actionnement pour chasses d'eau montées dans le mur

Publication

EP 2028323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014678 A

Priority

DE 102007039948 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a set of actuating keys (3, 4) movably guided into a base body, and a set of actuating covers (2) for covering the actuating keys. The actuating covers are rotated around an axis perpendicular to a plane and are detachably connected with the actuating keys, where the detachment of a connection takes place only by a side of the device. The side is turned towards an inspection chamber. A locking connection is made between the covers and the keys, and a set of latching hooks (11, 12) is elastically supported on the actuating keys.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Betätigungsvorrichtung für ein Ablaufventil eines Wandeinbauspülkastens mit einem Halterahmen (7), der an einem Revisionsschacht befestigt ist, einer Abdeckplatte (1), die lösbar an dem Halterahmen (7) befestigt ist, einem Grundkörper (8), der die Elemente zur Steuerung des Ablaufventils aufnimmt, und der an der dem Revisionsschacht zugewandeten Seite der Abdeckplatte (1) mit dieser verbunden ist, einer Betätigungstaste (3, 4), die beweglich im Grundkörper (8) geführt ist und einer Betätigungskappe (2), die zur Abdeckung der Betätigungstaste (3) dient, ist vorgesehen, dass die Betätigungskappe (2) um eine Achse senkrecht zur ihrer Ebene drehbar ist und lösbar mit der Betätigungstaste (3) verbunden ist, wobei die Lösung der Verbindung nur von der dem Revisionsschacht zugewandten Seite der Betätigungsvorrichtung erfolgt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/02 (2013.01); E03D 5/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1647638 A2 20060419 - GROHEDAL SANITAERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028323 A2 20090225; EP 2028323 A3 20140423; EP 2028323 B1 20180404; DE 102007039948 A1 20090312; DE 102007039948 B4 20120119

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015997

2018-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 985745 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-11-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171020

2016-11-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161021

2015-09-02 [D11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)

2015-01-21 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20141212

2014-12-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2014-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-12-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E03D 5/02 20060101AFI20140319BHEP

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHEDAL SANITAERSYSTEME GMBH

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS