Global Patent Index - EP 2028324 A1

EP 2028324 A1 2009-02-25 - Manhole or inspection chamber

Title (en)

Manhole or inspection chamber

Title (de)

Kontroll- und Einstiegsschacht

Title (fr)

Regard de chaussée

Publication

EP 2028324 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07398011 A

Priority

EP 07398011 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to manholes or inspection chambers for sewer or rainwater drainage systems, which allow, due to the special configuration of its bases, the connection of the inlet pipes in the manhole, independently of the angle that these form with the outlet pipe, keeping the guided flow channel in the direction of the outlet. The present invention possibly contains a central flow channel (2) and lateral flow channels (3) that guide the effluent to the outlet (1) thus allowing, independently of the position of the pipe connection in the sidewall (5) of the Manhole or inspection chamber, the manhole to be opened "in situ" and the connection of the pipes in a specific position, always maintaining the flow guided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028324 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110208

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090807

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS