Global Patent Index - EP 2028326 A1

EP 2028326 A1 2009-02-25 - Cavity wall spacer, building structure and method

Title (en)

Cavity wall spacer, building structure and method

Title (de)

Abstandshalter für Hohlwände, Gebäude und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Espaceur pour murs creux, bâtiment et procédé

Publication

EP 2028326 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07253268 A

Priority

EP 07253268 A

Abstract (en)

A cavity wall spacer, a building structure and method are disclosed. The cavity wall spacer determines a separation of building elements of two leaves of a wall during construction. The cavity wall spacer comprises: a support body; and a plurality of spaced projections upstanding from the support body and operable to extend across a cavity between the two leaves, each projection having a recessed channel operable to inhibit transfer of moisture from one end of each projection to another. The recessed channel or groove helps to prevent the passage of moisture along the length of the projection which provides an efficient way of preventing moisture travelling between the two leaves of the wall. Also, a recessed channel reduces the amount of moisture which drips into the cavity since the moisture is more likely to track back along the surface of the projection. Additionally, providing a recessed channel ensures no external obstruction on the projections which helps to achieve a significantly improved stacking density. Furthermore, the projections are less prone to any damage since there are no external protrusions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7069 (2013.01); E04B 1/7612 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2388614 A 20031119 - AYERS CHARLES WILLIAM JACK [GB], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028326 A1 20090225; CA 2639142 A1 20090220; CA 2639142 C 20150811; US 2009056263 A1 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-02 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180410

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090922

2009-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS