Global Patent Index - EP 2028332 A2

EP 2028332 A2 2009-02-25 - Method for obtaining tiles for removable floors

Title (en)

Method for obtaining tiles for removable floors

Title (de)

Verfahren zu Herstellung von Fliesen für demontierbare Böden

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de carreaux pour revêtements de sol démontables

Publication

EP 2028332 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08380253 A

Priority

  • ES 200702321 A
  • ES 200801013 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists in laying a series of small pieces (3) over the cavity (2) established inside a supporting structure (1), where said cavity has a quadrangular or four-sides contour and its shape matches the master template of the piece to be obtained. The dimensions of the small pieces (3) must be submultiples of the corresponding quadrangular side of the cavity (2) and therefore of the master template. After the small pieces (3) have been laid in the aforementioned manner a layer of glue (4) is applied on their visible face that is then fixed by superimposing a support plate (5) over them which causes all the pieces to come together forming a single block. After said block has been extracted from the cavity (2) grooves (6) are grinded on the visible face of the small pieces (3) in a crisscross pattern forming a square grid and thus obtaining the definitive tile that can then be used in removable floor applications.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01); B44C 1/28 (2006.01); B44C 3/12 (2006.01); E04F 15/022 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/022 (2013.01); B44C 1/28 (2013.01); B44C 3/12 (2013.01); E04F 15/041 (2013.01); E04F 2203/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028332 A2 20090225; EP 2028332 A3 20120118

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120719

2012-11-15 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-09-26 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2012-09-26 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 13/08 20060101AFI20111212BHEP

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 15/022 20060101ALI20111212BHEP

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 1/28 20060101ALI20111212BHEP

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 3/12 20060101ALI20111212BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS