Global Patent Index - EP 2028335 A1

EP 2028335 A1 2009-02-25 - Safe for the deposit of valuables of different nature

Title (en)

Safe for the deposit of valuables of different nature

Title (de)

Tresor zur Aufbewahrung von Wertgegenständen unterschiedlicher Art

Title (fr)

Structure de coffre de dépôt de valeurs de différentes natures

Publication

EP 2028335 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08162708 A

Priority

FR 0757091 A

Abstract (en)

The structure (1) has a case (2) associated to an information processing unit (3) that is connected to a multifunction display (4) with touch screen, printer (6), scanner (7) and bank note/ticket/cheque reader (8). The case has channels (11, 14) for guiding the valuables towards a manual deposition receptacle (12), cassette (15) and money storage receptacle (16). An identification tag reader (5) and capturing unit (17) are connected to the information processing unit. The capturing unit is formed by a camera and captures the environment before the structure.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une structure de coffre de dépôt de valeurs de différentes natures. Cette structure est caractérisée en ce qu 'elle comporte un coffre (2) associé à une unité de traitement d'informations (3) raccordée à un afficheur multifonctions (4), une imprimante (6), un scanner (7), un lecteur de badge d'identification (5), un lecteur de billets/titres/chèques (8) et en ce que le coffre comporte différents moyens (7, 8, 10) de réception des valeurs de différentes natures et des moyens de guidage (11, 14) de celles-ci vers des zones sécurisées (12, 15, 16) de stockage de celles-ci dans le coffre.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 7/00 (2006.01); E05G 1/06 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 7/001 (2013.01); E05G 1/06 (2013.01); G07D 11/009 (2013.01); G07F 9/06 (2013.01); G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/202 (2013.01); G07G 1/0027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1324287 A2 20030702 - NCR INT INC [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR LU NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028335 A1 20090225; FR 2920182 A1 20090227

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170308

2016-11-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161028

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR LU NL

2009-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090721

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS