Global Patent Index - EP 2028336 A1

EP 2028336 A1 2009-02-25 - SET OF TOOLS AND PROFILES FOR FORMING A SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR CUPBOARD DOORS AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

SET OF TOOLS AND PROFILES FOR FORMING A SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR CUPBOARD DOORS AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

SATZ VON WERKZEUGEN UND PROFILEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER STÜTZSTRUKTUR FÜR SCHRANKTÜREN UND ÄHNLICHES

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE FERRURES ET PROFILS POUR RÉALISATION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT DE PORTES D'ARMOIRE ET D'ARTICLES SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 2028336 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07788587 A

Priority

  • ES 2007000339 W
  • ES 200601385 U

Abstract (en)

Set of fittings and profiles for building a bearing structure for closet doors and alike, comprising two frames (2-2') that can be folded together through a hinge (3), having the first frame (2) vertical profiles (4) and horizontal profiles (5), and the second frame, vertical profiles (4') and horizontal profiles (5'). The set has sliding elements (7) on the vertexes (6) of the first frame (2) furthest away from the joint area between both frames, pivot elements (8) on the vertexes (6') of the second frame (2'), opposing the vertexes (6) of the structure, angle bracket fasteners (10) on the rest of the vertexes (9-9') of the first (2) and second (2') frames and a series of fixing braces (17-17') on each one of the frames (2-2'), that join together the vertical profiles (4) and (4') of each frame and are parallel to the corresponding horizontal profiles (5) and (5') in each case.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/32 (2006.01); E05D 15/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E06B 3/964 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/006 (2013.01); E06B 3/482 (2013.01); E06B 3/9647 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028336 A1 20090225; EP 2028336 A4 20100728; ES 1064166 U 20070216; ES 1064166 Y 20070516; WO 2007147913 A1 20071227

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-07-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 3/32 20060101AFI20080228BHEP

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 3/48 20060101ALI20100618BHEP

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/26 20060101ALI20100618BHEP

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 3/964 20060101ALI20100618BHEP

2009-10-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNAL LLOR, ANDRES

2009-08-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNAL LLOR, ANDRES

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNAL LLOR, ANDRES

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNAL LLOR, ANDRES

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS