Global Patent Index - EP 2028365 A2

EP 2028365 A2 2009-02-25 - Starting device for engines

Title (en)

Starting device for engines

Title (de)

Anlassvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de démarrage pour moteurs à combustion

Publication

EP 2028365 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08014722 A

Priority

JP 2007213970 A

Abstract (en)

A starting device for engines (1) comprises a first rotor (2), a second rotor (3) and a one-way clutch (4). The one-way clutch (4) comprises a clutch inner (41) independently or integrally formed with the first rotor (2) and fixed to the first rotor (2); a clutch outer (42) disposed in an outer circumference side of the clutch Inner (41) and fixed to the second rotor (3); and a clutch engaging member (43) disposed in a space formed between the clutch Inner (41) and the clutch outer (42). A seal member (5) is disposed between the clutch-engaging member (43) and the first rotor (2), and between the clutch outer (42) and the clutch Inner (41). The seal member (5) comprises an outer circumference contacting an inner circumference of the clutch outer (42) and an inner circumference contacting an outer circumference of the clutch inner (41). Either the outer circumference side or the inner circumference side is fixed, while the other side is left free and provided with a lip portion (5a).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/023 (2013.01); F02N 11/0814 (2013.01); F02N 2250/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028365 A2 20090225; EP 2028365 A3 20100519; EP 2028365 B1 20120516; JP 2009047075 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-06-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008015505

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-01-31 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602008015505

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-07-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008015505

- Effective date: 20120712

2012-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2011-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2010-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100916

2010-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS