Global Patent Index - EP 2028372 A2

EP 2028372 A2 2009-02-25 - Stator for an eccentric screw pump or an eccentric screw motor in accordance with the Moineau principle

Title (en)

Stator for an eccentric screw pump or an eccentric screw motor in accordance with the Moineau principle

Title (de)

Stator für eine Exzenterschneckenpumpe oder einen Exzenterschenkenmotor nach dem Moineau-Prinzip

Title (fr)

Stator pour une pompe à vis sans fin excentrique ou un moteur à vis sans fin excentrique selon le principe Moineau

Publication

EP 2028372 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08018529 A

Priority

  • EP 04803164 A
  • US 71481203 A

Abstract (en)

Two inner tubes (2,3), each provided with apertures (4,5), are disposed in an elastomeric lining provided to an outer tube (1). The lining has a hollow space or cavity and assumes a double or multiple spiral shape to accommodate a rigid spiral rotor. The stator has one more spiral than the rotor. An independent claim is also included for a stator production method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Stator für eine Exzenterschneckenpumpe oder einen Exzenterschneckenmotor. Der erfindungsgemäße Stator umfasst ein Außenrohr mit einer Auskleidung aus Gummi oder einem gummiähnlichen Werkstoff und einen nach Art eines zwei- oder mehrgängigen Steilgewindes geformten Hohlraum zur Aufnahme eines starren, ebenfalls nach Art eines Steilgewindes geformten Rotors, wobei der Stator jeweils einen Gang mehr aufweist als das Steilgewinde des Rotors, und das Außenrohr dergestalt geformt ist, dass die Wandstärke der Auskleidung gleich oder nahezu gleich ist. In der Auskleidung sind zwei Durchbrechungen aufweisende Innenrohre angeordnet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/107 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/1075 (2013.01); F04C 15/0003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2005106052 A1 20050519; US 7131827 B2 20061107; BR PI0416662 A 20070116; BR PI0416662 B1 20170207; CA 2473001 A1 20050517; CA 2473001 C 20110419; CA 2712364 A1 20050517; CA 2712364 C 20130827; DE 502004009512 D1 20090702; EP 1738078 A2 20070103; EP 1738078 B1 20090520; EP 2028372 A2 20090225; EP 2028372 A3 20140827; EP 2028372 B1 20150729; US 2007053783 A1 20070308; US 7329106 B2 20080212; WO 2005047702 A2 20050526; WO 2005047702 A3 20051124

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160502

2016-05-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502004014981

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-09-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502004014981

2015-07-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1738078 P

2015-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-07-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-05-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150428

2015-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150224

2015-04-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 2/107 20060101AFI20140804BHEP

2014-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 2/107 20060101AFI20140718BHEP

2014-08-20 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2014-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-08-06 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2014-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 2/107 20060101AFI20140703BHEP

2014-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 2/107 20060101AFI20140624BHEP

2009-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1738078 P

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB