Global Patent Index - EP 2028418 A2

EP 2028418 A2 2009-02-25 - Deslagging device for combustion plants

Title (en)

Deslagging device for combustion plants

Title (de)

Entschlackungsvorrichtung für Verbrennungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de décendrage pour installations de combustion

Publication

EP 2028418 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08162405 A

Priority

CH 13072007 A

Abstract (en)

The deslagging device (20) has a lock element, which is attached between an inner area (18) and an outer area (19). A housing (39) is provided with two openings and one of the opening is arranged against the inner area of a combustion plant and another opening is arranged against the outer area. A slag container (21) is provided, which comprises an opening (25) over its entire length.

Abstract (de)

Eine Entschlackungsvorrichtung (20) für die Beförderung von Schlacke (39) aus einem Innenraum (18) einer Verbrennungsanlage weist ein Schleusenelement auf, wobei das Schleusenelement aus einem Gehäuse (39) und einem darin angeordneten drehbar gelagerten einkammerigen Schlackenbehälter (21) besteht. Das Gehäuse (39) weist zwei Öffnungen auf, mit einer ersten Öffnung gegen den Innenraum (18) der Verbrennungsanlage hin und einer zweiten Öffnung gegen den Aussenraum (19) hin. Der Schlackenbehälter (21) weist über seine gesamte Länge eine Öffnung (25) auf, und kann von einer Befüllstellung, in welcher diese Öffnung (25) im wesentlichen mit der ersten Öffnung des Gehäuses (39) überlappt, in eine Entleerungsstellung gedreht werden, in welcher die Öffnung (25) im wesentlichen mit der zweiten Öffnung des Gehäuses (39) überlappt. Das Gehäuse (39) umfasst Wände (35, 36), die bündig zur Aussenwand (28a) des Schlackenbehälters (21) angeordnet sind, so dass sowohl in der Befüllungsstellung als auch in der Entleerungsstellung das Schleusenelement einen Gas- bzw. Luftfluss zwischen Innenraum (18) und Aussenraum (19) durch die Entschlackungsvorrichtung (20) hindurch verhindert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028418 A2 20090225; EP 2028418 A3 20120530

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-28 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-02-06 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-02-06 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23J 1/02 20060101AFI20120420BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS