Global Patent Index - EP 2028419 A2

EP 2028419 A2 2009-02-25 - Exhaust gas device for a combustion device in a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Exhaust gas device for a combustion device in a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Abgasvorrichtung für eine Brenneinrichtung in einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de gaz d'échappement pour une installation de combustion dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 2028419 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013686 A

Priority

DE 102007039984 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an exhaust duct (1) for guiding exhaust gas from a combustion device into environment. An air duct (2) partly surrounds the exhaust duct and is opened to the environment. A blower device (3) is arranged in the air duct for producing air flow in the air duct. The air flow in the air duct exhibits a flow direction to the environment. A combustion air duct is provided at the air duct for supplying combustion air from the environment to the combustion device. The air duct has a high-pressure section (2b) and a low-pressure section (2a), which are arranged axial to each other.

Abstract (de)

Eine Abgasvorrichtung für eine Brenneinrichtung in einem mobilen Raum weist einen Abgaskanal (1) zum Führen von Abgas von der Brenneinrichtung in die Umgebung, und einen Luftkanal (2) auf, der den Abgaskanal (1) wenigstens teilweise umgibt und zur Umgebung hin geöffnet ist. Eine Gebläseeinrichtung (3) ist in dem Luftkanal (2) angeordnet und erzeugt eine Luftströmung in dem Luftkanal (2), die eine Strömungsrichtung A zur Umgebung hin aufweist. Auf diese Weise wird Abgas, das über Undichtigkeiten aus dem Abgaskanal (1) entweicht, sicher zur Umgebung abgeführt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 11/04 (2006.01); F23L 17/00 (2006.01); F23L 17/02 (2006.01); F23L 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 11/04 (2013.01); F23L 17/005 (2013.01); F23L 17/02 (2013.01); F23L 17/16 (2013.01); F23J 2211/10 (2013.01); F23J 2211/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028419 A2 20090225; EP 2028419 A3 20130619; DE 102007039984 A1 20090226; DE 102007039984 B4 20151112

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180515

2015-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151030

2014-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131218

2014-02-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 17/02 20060101ALI20130515BHEP

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 17/16 20060101ALI20130515BHEP

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 17/00 20060101ALI20130515BHEP

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23J 11/04 20060101AFI20130515BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS