Global Patent Index - EP 2028426 A1

EP 2028426 A1 2009-02-25 - Pipe-connection searching apparatus for multi-air conditioner

Title (en)

Pipe-connection searching apparatus for multi-air conditioner

Title (de)

Rohrverbindungs-Suchvorrichtung für Mehrfachklimaanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil de recherche de connexion de tuyau pour climatiseur d'air multiple

Publication

EP 2028426 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162685 A

Priority

KR 20070083615 A

Abstract (en)

A pipe-connection searching apparatus and method for a multiple air conditioner. The apparatus and method involving the identification of one of a plurality of indoor units, based on temperature criteria, and matching the one indoor unit to a corresponding one of a plurality of pipes that connect an outdoor unit to the plurality of indoor units, respectively.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/065 (2013.01); F24F 1/26 (2013.01); F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 11/83 (2018.01); F24F 2110/10 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028426 A1 20090225; EP 2028426 B1 20180523; CN 101373094 A 20090225; KR 101403829 B1 20140603; KR 20090019302 A 20090225; US 2009049850 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2018-05-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-01-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171212

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090921

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080917

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS