Global Patent Index - EP 2028431 A2

EP 2028431 A2 2009-02-25 - Multiple chamber flat pipe, heat exchanger and use of a heat exchanger

Title (en)

Multiple chamber flat pipe, heat exchanger and use of a heat exchanger

Title (de)

Mehrkammer-Flachrohr, Wärmetauscher und Verwendung eines Wärmetauschers

Title (fr)

Tuyau plat à plusieurs chambres, échangeur thermique et utilisation d'un échangeur thermique

Publication

EP 2028431 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014698 A

Priority

DE 102007039292 A

Abstract (en)

The tube (V8) has side sections, where one of the sections has an edge section (3B) that includes two deforming sections (3B.1-3B.3). One of the deforming sections forming a bearing surface (9) runs diagonal or perpendicular to a wide wall (6). The other deforming section runs diagonal or perpendicular to the former deforming section. An edge section (3A) of other side section is free from the latter deforming section and a part of the wall. The section (3A) has deforming sections e.g. I-shaped deforming sections, which run perpendicular or parallel to the wall.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem Mehrkammerflachrohr (V1-V17) mit wenigstens zwei Kammern (1,2) zur Strömungsaufnahme eines Fluids, hergestellt durch Umformen eines Blechbandes, insbesondere durch ein Biege- und/oder Falt- und/oder Falzverfahren, bei dem ein geschlossenes Profil gebildet ist, wobei sich jeweils gegenüberliegende Breitwände (4,6) und Schmalwände (5,7) miteinander verbunden sind, wobei die Breitwände (4,6) mit einem die wenigstens zwei Kammern trennenden, eine Innenseite des Profils bildenden Steg (3) stoffschlüssig verbunden, insbesondere lötverbunden sind, der mit einem Randabschnitt wenigstens eines der Seitenabschnitte des Blechbandes gebildet ist. Zur Verbesserung eines solchen Mehrkammer-Flachrohres sieht die Erfindung eine besondere Ausgestaltung des Steges (3) in unterschiedlichen Varianten vor. Weiter führt die Erfindung auf einen entsprechenden Wärmetauscher und eine entsprechende Verwendung des Wärmetauschers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0391 (2013.01); F28F 1/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028431 A2 20090225; EP 2028431 A3 20130424; DE 102007039292 A1 20090226; US 2009050306 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2014-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-01-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-12-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 1/02 20060101ALI20130319BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/03 20060101AFI20130319BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 1/02 20060101ALI20130219BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/03 20060101AFI20130219BHEP

2012-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 1/02 20060101ALI20120921BHEP

2012-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/03 20060101AFI20120921BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS