Global Patent Index - EP 2028433 A1

EP 2028433 A1 2009-02-25 - Anti-rotation extractor for shotgun, and related shotgun

Title (en)

Anti-rotation extractor for shotgun, and related shotgun

Title (de)

Verdrehsicherer Auswerfer für Jagdgewehr sowie entsprechendes Jagdgewehr

Title (fr)

Extracteur anti-rotatif pour fusil de chasse et fusil de chasse correspondant

Publication

EP 2028433 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08104845 A

Priority

IT BS20070110 A

Abstract (en)

An anti-rotation extractor (4) for shotgun (24), in particular for a break-action shotgun, suitable for ejecting the cartridge case when the break-action is opened. The extractor (4) is guided by a housing (16) on the breech (20) of the shotgun with which it creates a prismatic type coupling in such a way as to ensure functioning without jamming.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028433 A1 20090225; IT BS20070110 A1 20090128

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100323

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090910

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS