Global Patent Index - EP 2028651 A1

EP 2028651 A1 2009-02-25 - Method and apparatus for detection of specific input signal contributions

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for detection of specific input signal contributions

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entdeckung spezieller Eingabesignalbeiträge

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la détection de contributions de signal d'entrée spécifiques

Publication

EP 2028651 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07114945 A

Priority

EP 07114945 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus and method for detecting a single source contribution in an input signal comprising contributions from more than one source. An input analysis device (3) receives the input signal, for providing a time-frequency representation of the input signal. A neural preprocessing device (5) is connected to the input analysis device (3), for separating a foreground signal from background signals in the time-frequency representation of the input signal. A feature estimation device (7) is connected to the neural preprocessing device (5) for detecting specific features in the foreground signal. A model activation device (11) is connected to the feature estimation device (7) for activating one or more of a set of models based on the detected specific features. A decision device (8) is connected to the model activation device (11) for monitoring the possible activation of a specific one of the models and generating an output based on the monitoring.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/02 (2006.01); G10L 21/0272 (2013.01); G10L 25/30 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0272 (2013.01); G10L 25/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] WO 0133547 A1 20010510 - HUQ SPEECH TECHNOLOGIES B V [NL], et al
  • [PX] PICHEVAR ET AL: "Monophonic sound source separation with an unsupervised network of spiking neurones", NEUROCOMPUTING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 71, no. 1-3, 3 November 2007 (2007-11-03), pages 109 - 120, XP022327394, ISSN: 0925-2312
  • [X] TEDDY S D ET AL: "Model-based approach to separating instrumental music from single track recordings", CONTROL, AUTOMATION, ROBOTICS AND VISION CONFERENCE, 2004. ICARCV 2004 8TH KUNMING, CHINA 6-9 DEC. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, 6 December 2004 (2004-12-06), pages 1808 - 1813Vol3, XP010815337, ISBN: 0-7803-8653-1
  • [X] DELIANG L WANG AND GUY J BROWN: "Separation of Speech from Interfering Sounds Based on Oscillatory Correlation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, vol. 10, no. 3, May 1999 (1999-05-01), pages 684 - 697, XP002461179

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028651 A1 20090225; WO 2009028937 A1 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS