Global Patent Index - EP 2028713 A1

EP 2028713 A1 2009-02-25 - Circulator / isolator housing with inserts

Title (en)

Circulator / isolator housing with inserts

Title (de)

Zirkulator- / Isolatorgehäuse mit Einsätzen

Title (fr)

Boîtier de circulation/isolation avec inserts

Publication

EP 2028713 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162501 A

Priority

  • US 96603007 P
  • US 90373007 A

Abstract (en)

A circulator/isolator housing (32) is provided that includes body and a plurality of slots (68) within the body configured to receive therethrough inserts (50) having magnetic permeability. The housing (32) further includes a plurality of receiving portions (72) within the body corresponding to the plurality of slots (68) and configured to maintain a position of the inserts (50).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/36 (2006.01); H01P 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/387 (2013.01); H01P 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028713 A1 20090225; US 2009051456 A1 20090226; US 2010315174 A1 20101216; US 7772937 B2 20100810; US 7936231 B2 20110503

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: M/A-COM TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS HOLDINGS, INC.

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090910

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COBHAM DEFENSE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS CORPORATION

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS