Global Patent Index - EP 2028732 A2

EP 2028732 A2 2009-02-25 - Device for creating a section of cable and subsequent preparation of a section of cable at its front and rear ends

Title (en)

Device for creating a section of cable and subsequent preparation of a section of cable at its front and rear ends

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen und nachfolgenden Konfektionieren eines Kabelabschnitts an seinem Vorder- und Hinterende

Title (fr)

Dispositif de production et de confection consécutive d'une section de câble sur son extrémité avant et arrière

Publication

EP 2028732 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014291 A

Priority

DE 102007040035 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves feeding a cable (1) into a cable cutting and manufacturing device (3) with the help of a cable feeder (2). The rear end of the swiveling arm (6) is conveyed in a position over a collective channel (11), which is arranged parallel to the conveyer belt. The gripper (6.1) of the swiveling arm (6) is opened. The rear end is discharged into the collective channel. The swiveling arm (6) is swiveled back into the base position inverse to another swiveling arm (5). An independent claim is included for a device for manufacturing section of cable and subsequent preparation of section of cable at its front and rear ends.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen und nachfolgenden Konfektionieren eines Kabelabschnitts mit einem Vorder- und einem Hinterende, umfassend einen Kabeltransporteur zum Einspeisen eines Kabel (1) in eine Konfektioniereinrichtung (3), die, in Laufrichtung (4) des Kabels (1) betrachtet, zwei in ihrer Grundstellung einander spiegelbildlich zugewandte Schwenkarme (5, 6) mit jeweils einem Greifer (5.1, 6.1) für das Kabel (1) umfasst, jeweils zumindest eine im Schwenkbereich der Schwenkarme (5, 6) seitlich benachbarte Konfektionierstation (7), ein im Schwenkbereich des zweiten Schwenkarms (6) angeordnetes Transportband (8) zum Abziehen des Kabels sowie eine sich parallel dazu erstreckende Sammelrinne (11), eine zwischen den Schwenkarmen (5, 6) angeordnete Kabeltrenneinrichtung (9), sowie eine Steuerung, durch zumindest der Kabeltransporteur (2), die Schwenkarme (5, 6), die Greifer (5.1, 6.1) der Schwenkarme (5, 6), die Konfektionierstationen (7, 10) und die Kabeltrenneinrichtung (9) aufeinander abgestimmt betätigbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1447888 A1 20040818 - KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028732 A2 20090225; EP 2028732 A3 20120725; EP 2028732 B1 20171122; DE 102007040035 A1 20090326; ES 2657690 T3 20180306; PL 2028732 T3 20180430

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171122

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171122

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171122

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180222

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171122

2018-04-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-03-28 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171122

2018-03-06 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2657690 T3

- Effective date: 20180306

2018-01-04 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015743

2017-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL, CH

2017-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 949226 T

- Effective date: 20171215

2017-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-07-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170613

2013-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130214

2012-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-07-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 43/28 20060101AFI20120618BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS