Global Patent Index - EP 2028875 A1

EP 2028875 A1 2009-02-25 - Digital audio signal amplifier

Title (en)

Digital audio signal amplifier

Title (de)

Digitaler Audiosignalverstärker

Title (fr)

Amplificateur de signal audio numérique

Publication

EP 2028875 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07114693 A

Priority

EP 07114693 A

Abstract (en)

A digital audio signal amplifier includes: a digital signal amplifying module having a digital audio signal plug connected with a digital audio signal outlet of a main board to receive digital audio signals, the digital signal amplifying module processing the digital audio signals to generate high power analog audio signals; and an analog signal output interface coupled to the digital signal amplifying module and transferring the high power analog audio signals to a set of speaker.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H03F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028875 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120301

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS