Global Patent Index - EP 2028876 A1

EP 2028876 A1 2009-02-25 - Loudspeaker spider

Title (en)

Loudspeaker spider

Title (de)

Lautsprecherspinne

Title (fr)

Suspension de centrage de haut-parleur

Publication

EP 2028876 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07016325 A

Priority

EP 07016325 A

Abstract (en)

A loudspeaker spider arrangement comprising: a loudspeaker spider comprising rubber or rubber-like material which has a central opening defining an inner rim, a periphery outer rim, and a spring effect portion provided at a portion located between the inner rim and the outer rim to enable the inner rim to be moved axially up and down with respect to the outer rim when a driving force is applied to the inner rim and be retained to an original equilibrium position after the driving force is released; and an integral conductor arrangement which comprises at least one conductor (13) where at least a portion of the at least one conductor extends from the inner rim to the outer rim of the loudspeaker spider.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028876 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160426

2012-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES LTD.

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS