Global Patent Index - EP 2028878 A2

EP 2028878 A2 2009-02-25 - Method for side definition when fitting hearing aids

Title (en)

Method for side definition when fitting hearing aids

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Seitendefinition bei der Anpassung von Hörhilfen

Title (fr)

Procédé de définition latérale à l'adaptation d'aides auditives

Publication

EP 2028878 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104813 A

Priority

DE 102007039447 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing a hearing aid with two hearing units (HA1,HA2) for a left ear (LE) and a right ear (RE). An adapter (AD) is provided with data exchange of one of the two hearing units. A side definition is provided for correct attaching of both the hearing units to the left or right ear, of the carrier of these hearing units. The carrier produces a signal (S-ig) at one of the two hearing units. An independent claim is included for a device for adjusting the hearing aids.

Abstract (de)

Die in den beiden Hörgeräten eines binauralen Hörsystems bei der Anpassung zu speichernden Datensätze sind im Allgemeinen verschieden. Bei der "Seitendefinition" wird die korrekte Zuordnung der beiden Hörgeräte (HA1, HA2) zu den Ohren (RE) bzw (LE) des Trägers sichergestellt. Dazu erzeugt der Träger an einem der beiden Hörgeräte ein Signal (Sig), welches von der Anpassungseinrichtung erkannt und zur Seitendefinition ausgewertet wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/70 (2013.01); H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 2420/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028878 A2 20090225; EP 2028878 A3 20110323; DE 102007039447 A1 20090226; US 2009052704 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110924

2012-01-19 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-11-30 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-03-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR SIDE DEFINITION WHEN FITTING HEARING AIDS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS