Global Patent Index - EP 2028912 A2

EP 2028912 A2 2009-02-25 - Cooking device assembly

Title (en)

Cooking device assembly

Title (de)

Kochvorrichtungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de dispositif de cuisson

Publication

EP 2028912 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08105057 A

Priority

ES 200702373 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a heating arrangement (34.1) of heating units, and a heat classification unit forming heating groups that are adapted to a selection position of a preparation dish. A power arrangement (38.1) of a power unit (26) produces heating power for the heating arrangement. A heat sink unit (46) forms heat receiving regions (56, 58) for receiving heat that is produced by the power arrangement. The heat sink unit is arranged below the heating arrangement in a base attachment position and arranged between the heating arrangement and the power arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer Kochvorrichtungsanordnung mit zumindest einer Heizanordnung (34.1) von Heizeinheiten (22), einer Heizgruppenbildungseinheit (32), die dazu vorgesehen ist, eine an eine Wahlposition eines Zubereitungsgeschirrs (18, 20) angepasste Heizgruppe (28, 30) von Heizeinheiten (22) zu bilden, und einer Leistungsanordnung (38.1) von Leistungseinheiten (26) zur Erzeugung von Heizleistung für die Heizanordnung (34.1). Um eine kompakte Bauweise zu erreichen, wird vorgeschlagen, dass die Kochvorrichtungsanordnung eine Kühlkörpereinheit (46) aufweist, die wenigstens einen ersten Wärmeaufnahmebereich (56, 58) zur Aufnahme einer von der Leistungsanordnung (38.1) erzeugten Wärme bildet und in einer Grundeinbaustellung unterhalb der Heizanordnung (34.1) angeordnet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/12 (2006.01); H05B 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/1263 (2013.01); H05B 2206/022 (2013.01); H05B 2213/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028912 A2 20090225; EP 2028912 A3 20091014; ES 2321467 A1 20090605; ES 2321467 B1 20100304

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-06-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150521

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2010-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100414

2009-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 6/12 20060101AFI20081126BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 6/42 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS