Global Patent Index - EP 2030738 B1

EP 2030738 B1 2013-09-04 - Vibrating hand machine tool with a locking switch for the motor switch

Title (en)

Vibrating hand machine tool with a locking switch for the motor switch

Title (de)

Vibrierende Handwerkzeugmaschine mit einem Arretierschalter des Motorschalters

Title (fr)

Machine-outil manuelle vibrante dotée d'un selecteur de blocage pour le commutateur du moteur

Publication

EP 2030738 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104836 A

Priority

DE 102007000470 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2030738A2] The tool has a guide handle including a motor switch for locking a locking switch (7). An operating mode selector switch (3) is arranged in a vibrating striking mechanism unit, and displaces a shift linkage (9) having a stop (10). The stop extends into switching area (X) in a rotary operating mode. The linkage is angularly formed with a rigid arm (16a) that forms the stop, and is pivotably mounted in a rotary and pivotal point (17) on the striking mechanism unit. The linkage is angularly formed with a flexible and axially extending arm (16b) that is connected with the switch (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/006 (2013.01); B25D 2250/255 (2013.01); B25D 2250/261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 2030738 A2 20090304; EP 2030738 A3 20120912; EP 2030738 B1 20130904; CN 101376243 A 20090304; CN 101376243 B 20131211; DE 102007000470 A1 20090305; ES 2427362 T3 20131030; JP 2009056589 A 20090319; JP 5221250 B2 20130626; US 2009056965 A1 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-09-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010594

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-06-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010594

2013-11-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-10-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008010594

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2427362 T3

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2013-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-06-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130516

2013-05-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2013-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 9/06 20060101ALI20130408BHEP

2013-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25D 16/00 20060101AFI20130408BHEP

2013-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130312

2012-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 9/06 20060101ALI20120803BHEP

2012-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25D 16/00 20060101AFI20120803BHEP

2009-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS