EP 2041697 A4 20120919 - SPECTRAL BIOMETRICS SENSOR
Title (en)
SPECTRAL BIOMETRICS SENSOR
Title (de)
SPEKTRUMSBIOMETRIESENSOR
Title (fr)
CAPTEURS BIOMÉTRIQUES SPECTRAUX
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2007073886 W 20070719
- US 45860706 A 20060719
- US 45861906 A 20060719
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2008111994A1] Methods and systems are provided for performing a biometric function. A purported skin site of an individual is illuminated with illumination light. The purported skin site is in contact with a surface. Light scattered from the purported skin site is received in a plane that includes the surface. An image is formed from the received light. An image-texture measure is generated from the image. The generated image-texture measure is analyzed to perform the biometric function.
IPC 8 full level
G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06K 9/20 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
G01N 21/25 (2013.01 - KR); G06F 18/00 (2023.01 - KR); G06V 40/1347 (2022.01 - EP); G06V 40/1394 (2022.01 - EP); A61B 5/1172 (2013.01 - EP); A61B 5/726 (2013.01 - EP); A61B 5/7264 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2006062438 A1 20060323 - ROWE ROBERT K [US]
- [X] WO 2005059805 A2 20050630 - LUMIDIGM INC [US], et al
- [X] WO 2004090786 A2 20041021 - LUMIDIGM INC [US], et al
- [X] US 2004125994 A1 20040701 - ENGELS ANGELA [DE], et al
- [X] US 2005265586 A1 20051201 - ROWE ROBERT K [US], et al
- [A] US 2002183624 A1 20021205 - ROWE ROBERT K [US], et al
- [A] US 5291560 A 19940301 - DAUGMAN JOHN G [GB]
- See references of WO 2008111994A1
Citation (examination)
- KAORU UCHIDA: "Detection and Recognition Technologies - Fingerprint Identification", NEC JOURNAL OF ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, 21 December 2005 (2005-12-21), pages 19 - 27, XP055594162, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/2f16/4d878942c2ebbdaf5e9c058a0d0d5e248ef4.pdf> [retrieved on 20190605]
- KAORU UCHIDA ED - DAVID ZHANG ET AL: "Image-Based Approach to Fingerprint Acceptability Assessment", 15 July 2004, BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 294 - 300, ISBN: 978-3-540-22146-3, XP019007750
- DATABASE INSPEC [online] THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB; March 2002 (2002-03-01), HIGUCHI T: "Fingerprint authentication system/new fingerprint sensor", Database accession no. 7303860 & NEC TECHNICAL JOURNAL NEC JAPAN, vol. 55, no. 3, 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 19 - 22, ISSN: 0285-4139
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2008111994 A1 20080918; CN 101529445 A 20090909; CN 101529445 B 20140430; EP 2041697 A1 20090401; EP 2041697 A4 20120919; IL 189797 A0 20081103; IL 189797 A 20141130; IL 196253 A0 20090922; IL 196253 A 20141130; JP 2009511094 A 20090319; JP 2009544106 A 20091210; KR 101433882 B1 20140922; KR 101489757 B1 20150204; KR 20080050460 A 20080605; KR 20090040436 A 20090424
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2007073886 W 20070719; CN 200780029057 A 20070719; EP 07873944 A 20070719; IL 18979708 A 20080226; IL 19625308 A 20081229; JP 2008529154 A 20060828; JP 2009520999 A 20070719; KR 20087007796 A 20060828; KR 20097003093 A 20070719