Global Patent Index - EP 2044613 A4

EP 2044613 A4 2010-02-10 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHEMICAL AND PHYSICAL CHARACTERIZATION OF COMPLEX SAMPLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHEMICAL AND PHYSICAL CHARACTERIZATION OF COMPLEX SAMPLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR CHEMISCHEN UND PHYSIKALISCHEN KENNZEICHNUNG KOMPLEXER PROBEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA CARACTÉRISATION CHIMIQUE ET PHYSIQUE D'ÉCHANTILLONS COMPLEXES

Publication

EP 2044613 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 07835930 A

Priority

  • US 2007015131 W
  • US 81707606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008005335A2] A method and system for rapid determination of a hydrocarbon type composition, such as crude oils and fractions thereof, and s obtaining the information necessary to assess the yield of commercially valuable fuel and lube oil fractions in a single process, variations of the method and system use Gas Chromatography - FID/Mass Spectrometry and other features, including an auto sampler, a wall coated capillary column, a temperature programmable injector, and a data processing system for compiling and processing the experimental data. The system and method further include a computer system with application software or other processing mechanism and optionally a communication network. One variation provides a graphical user interface for the entry of data and for displaying information, such as in a graphical manner, to show the relationship of various determined outputs and results.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/10 (2006.01); G01N 30/68 (2006.01); G01N 30/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 3291980 A 19661213 - COATES VINCENT J, et al
  • [XY] EP 0921393 A2 19990609 - GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0833155 A1 19980401 - EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]
  • [Y] US 6354136 B1 20020312 - BREMER RALF [DE], et al
  • [Y] US 2006125826 A1 20060615 - LUBKOWITZ JOAQUIN A [US], et al
  • [XP] WO 2007047770 A2 20070426 - SEPARATION SYSTEMS INC [US], et al
  • [XY] OHBA T ET AL: "DECOMPOSITION PROPERTY OF METHYLHYDRAZINE WITH TITANIUM NITRIDATIONLOW TEMPERATURE", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, vol. 142, no. 3, 1 March 1995 (1995-03-01), pages 934 - 938, XP000504900, ISSN: 0013-4651
  • [XY] NITZ S; DRAWERT F, GELLERT U: "A Variable Effluent Splitter for Simultaneous Sniffing-MS-Monitoring", CHROMATOGRAPHIA, vol. 22, no. 1-6, June 1986 (1986-06-01), VIEWEG&SOHN VERLAG, pages 51 - 54, XP002561130

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008005335 A2 20080110; WO 2008005335 A3 20080703; CA 2659402 A1 20080110; CA 2659402 C 20150203; EP 2044613 A2 20090408; EP 2044613 A4 20100210; MX 2009000099 A 20090213

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100426

2010-02-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 30/10 20060101AFI20091228BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 30/68 20060101ALI20091228BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 30/72 20060101ALI20091228BHEP

2009-10-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS