EP 2056244 A1 20090506 - Method of generating event reminders in an electronic device
Title (en)
Method of generating event reminders in an electronic device
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Ereignis-Remindern in einem elektronischen Gerät
Title (fr)
Procédé de génération de rappel d'événements dans un dispositif électronique
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 07119555 A 20071029
Abstract (en)
A reminder method and user interface for an electronic device, including displaying a picture on the electronic device, activating a timer associated with the picture for generating a reminder after a programmable time period, and generating the reminder on the electronic device after the programmable time period, wherein the reminder includes displaying the picture. Management of alerts or reminders for a calendar, said functionality comprising the snooze option for deferring or postponing a further alert within a predetermined time period.
IPC 8 full level
G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06Q 10/109 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2003189877 A1 20031009 - BUBAR DAVID N [US]
- [X] US 2006200842 A1 20060907 - CHAPMAN ANN E [US], et al
- [X] JP H0497684 A 19920330 - OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD
- [X] US 5788505 A 19980804 - SHARKEY JOHN J [US]
- [X] EP 0740255 A1 19961030 - SHARP KK [JP]
- [X] US 2005081154 A1 20050414 - VOGEL JEFF [US]
- [A] US 5031937 A 19910716 - NELLHAUS GERHARD [US]
- [X] IBM: "LOTUS NOTES 7 - Release 7.0.2 HF698", ., 11 July 2007 (2007-07-11), XP002462878
Citation (examination)
- INTERNET CITATION, DOWNLOAD32.COM, 2 August 2005 (2005-08-02), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.download32.com/monkeymen-calendar-i6194.html>
- INTERNET CITATION: "monkeymen calendas v3.1", FILEHEAP.COM, 2 August 2005 (2005-08-02), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.fileheap.com/software-monkeymen-calendar-download-6194.html>
- INTERNET CITATION: "screensaver maker 3.6", WARESEEKER.COM, 22 May 2006 (2006-05-22), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://wareseeker.com/Home-Shell-Desktop/2d-3d-screensaver-maker-3.6.zip/243159>
- INTERNET CITATION: "create screensaver software", PROGRAMURL.COM, 14 March 2005 (2005-03-14), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.programurl.com/software/create-screensaver.htm>
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 07119555 A 20071029; CA 2641749 A 20081023