Global Patent Index - EP 2061286 A3

EP 2061286 A3 2013-09-25 - Induction coil, method and device for inductive warming of metallic construction elements

Title (en)

Induction coil, method and device for inductive warming of metallic construction elements

Title (de)

Induktionsspule, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur induktiven Erwärmung von metallischen Bauelemten

Title (fr)

Bobine à induction, procédé et dispositif de chauffage inductif de composants métalliques

Publication

EP 2061286 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 08169046 A

Priority

DE 102007054782 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2061286A2] The induction coil (10) is formed in meander-shape and is molded around metallic components, such that it extends in the area of the surface to be heated or multiple surfaces to be heated over a partial area of the lateral surfaces of the components. The three dimensional arrangement of the induction coil matches the geometry of the components. Independent claims are included for the following: (1) a method for inductive heating up of metallic components, particularly components of a gas turbine; (2) a device for heating up of metallic components, particularly components of a gas turbine (3) and (4) a component is a bling or a blisk.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/40 (2013.01); H05B 6/101 (2013.01); H05B 6/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XI] US 4820892 A 19890411 - HOLMSTROEM GERT [SE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2061286 A2 20090520; EP 2061286 A3 20130925; CA 2643530 A1 20090516; DE 102007054782 A1 20090520; US 2009127254 A1 20090521

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160429

2015-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES AG

2014-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2014-07-03 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ LI

2014-05-27 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2014-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 6/02 20060101AFI20130821BHEP

2009-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS