Global Patent Index - EP 2063063 A3

EP 2063063 A3 2013-09-25 - Retractable covering for an architectural opening

Title (en)

Retractable covering for an architectural opening

Title (de)

Einziehbare Abdeckung für eine architektonische Öffnung

Title (fr)

Couvercle rétractable pour ouverture architecturale

Publication

EP 2063063 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08253603 A

Priority

  • EP 07022608 A
  • EP 08253603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2063063A2] A retractable covering device for architectural openings, such as a Venetian blind is adapted for use with escape openings in building structures. The retractable covering device includes a collapsible covering member, a bottom bar, at least one flexible element in engagement with the bottom bar for raising the bottom bar, a primary retraction mechanism for retracting a first end of the at least one flexible element, and a secondary retraction mechanism operatively connected with the bottom bar for selectively also retracting the covering member. The bottom bar is positioned along a first edge of the collapsible covering member and the at least one flexible element is in engagement with the bottom bar. Raising the bottom bar by the at least one flexible element collapses the covering member and defines a retracted position of the covering device. The secondary retraction mechanism is arranged for retracting a second end of the at least one flexible element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/308 (2006.01); E06B 9/322 (2006.01); E06B 9/327 (2006.01); E06B 9/388 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/322 (2013.01); E06B 9/308 (2013.01); E06B 9/388 (2013.01); E06B 9/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2063063 A2 20090527; EP 2063063 A3 20130925

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160902

2014-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140324

2014-04-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/308 20060101ALI20130816BHEP

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/327 20060101ALI20130816BHEP

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/32 20060101AFI20130816BHEP

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/322 20060101ALI20130816BHEP

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/388 20060101ALI20130816BHEP

2009-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS