EP 2068613 A4 20100505 - SALT TOLERANT PLANTS
Title (en)
SALT TOLERANT PLANTS
Title (de)
SALZTOLERANTE PFLANZEN
Title (fr)
PLANTES TOLERANT LE SEL
Publication
Application
Priority
- AU 2007001280 W 20070831
- AU 2006904749 A 20060831
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2008025097A1] The present invention relates to polypeptides, and polynucleotides encoding therefor, with cation transporter activity. In particular, the present invention relates to methods for producing, identifying, and/or breeding transgenic or non-transgenic plants, especially wheat or barley plants, with enhanced tolerance to saline and/or sodic soils, and/or reduced sodium accumulation in an aerial part of the plant. Also provided are plants produced using these methods.
IPC 8 full level
A01H 1/00 (2006.01); A01H 1/02 (2006.01); A01H 1/04 (2006.01); A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01H 5/10 (2018.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A01H 1/045 (2021.01 - EP US); A01H 5/10 (2013.01 - EP US); A01H 6/4678 (2018.04 - EP US); C07K 14/415 (2013.01 - EP); C12N 15/8273 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] MUNNS RANA ET AL: "Genetic control of sodium exclusion in durum wheat.", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH, vol. 54, no. 7, 2003, pages 627 - 635, XP008120575, ISSN: 0004-9409
- [X] MUNNS RANA ET AL: "Approaches to increasing the salt tolerance of wheat and other cereals", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, vol. 57, no. 5, 1 January 2006 (2006-01-01), pages 1025 - 1043, XP002537449, ISSN: 0022-0957, [retrieved on 20060301]
- [X] COLMER TIMOTHY D ET AL: "Use of wild relatives to improve salt tolerance in wheat", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, vol. 57, no. 5, March 2006 (2006-03-01), pages 1059 - 1078, XP002574917, ISSN: 0022-0957
- [XD] MUNNS R ET AL: "Genetic variation for improving the salt tolerance of durum wheat", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH, ORGANIZATION, MELBOURNE, AU, vol. 51, no. 1, 1 January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages 69 - 74, XP009120126, ISSN: 0004-9409
- [A] PLATTEN J D ET AL: "Nomenclature for HKT transporters, key determinants of plant salinity tolerance", TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, vol. 11, no. 8, 1 August 2006 (2006-08-01), pages 372 - 374, XP025153881, ISSN: 1360-1385, [retrieved on 20060801]
- [XP] HUANG SHAOBAI ET AL: "A sodium transporter (HKT7) is a candidate for Nax1, a gene for salt tolerance in durum wheat", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), vol. 142, no. 4, December 2006 (2006-12-01), pages 1718 - 1727, XP002574918, ISSN: 0032-0889
- See references of WO 2008025097A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2008025097 A1 20080306; AU 2007291889 A1 20080306; EP 2068613 A1 20090617; EP 2068613 A4 20100505
DOCDB simple family (application)
AU 2007001280 W 20070831; AU 2007291889 A 20070831; EP 07800238 A 20070831