Global Patent Index - EP 2107199 B1

EP 2107199 B1 2013-09-04 - Fitting for an at least tiltable and/or parallel parkable wing of a window, door or similar

Title (en)

Fitting for an at least tiltable and/or parallel parkable wing of a window, door or similar

Title (de)

Beschlag für einen zumindest kippbaren und/oder parallelabstellbaren Flügel eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Armature pour un battant au moins pivotant et/ou basculant parallèlement d'une fenêtre, d'une porte ou analogue

Publication

EP 2107199 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 09002984 A

Priority

DE 202008004933 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2107199A2] The fitting has running gears (26, 28) and a locking device for lower and upper drawing arms (18 - 24) present in a parallel stoppage position. The drawing arm (18) is lockable in a closing condition of a flank (14) by using a control arm, and a catch element of the control arm is engaged in a locking recess. The locking recess is mounted in a fixed frame (10). The control arm is penetrated over a guiding bolt relocatably guided in a control groove.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/10 (2006.01); E05C 17/08 (2006.01); E05C 17/16 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1013 (2013.01); E05D 15/0669 (2013.01); E05F 11/145 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 202008004933 U1 20080619; EP 2107199 A2 20091007; EP 2107199 A3 20100602; EP 2107199 B1 20130904

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502009007923

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 630649 T

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2014-11-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502009007923

2014-09-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502009007923

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-06-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502009007923

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-10-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502009007923

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 630649 T

- Effective date: 20130915

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2013-07-31 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/08 20060101ALI20130605BHEP

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/06 20060101ALI20130605BHEP

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/16 20060101ALI20130605BHEP

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/10 20060101AFI20130605BHEP

2013-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/16 20060101ALI20130123BHEP

2013-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/08 20060101ALI20130123BHEP

2013-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/10 20060101AFI20130123BHEP

2011-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2010-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/10 20060101AFI20090713BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/08 20060101ALI20100428BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/16 20060101ALI20100428BHEP

2009-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS