Global Patent Index - EP 2110334 A4

EP 2110334 A4 2013-09-11 - DISMOUNTABLE BOX

Title (en)

DISMOUNTABLE BOX

Title (de)

DEMONTIERBARER KASTEN

Title (fr)

BOÎTE DÉMONTABLE

Publication

EP 2110334 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 07858267 A

Priority

  • ES 2007000691 W
  • ES 200603112 A
  • ES 200702518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2110334A1] Dismountable box, formed by a contour whose lateral (1) and end (2) pieces have hooking shapes as extensions of their end pegs (5), said pieces (1 and 2) coupling to corner blocks (3) which determine slots for the fitting of the pegs (5), slots wherein are provided wedges (3.2), whereto a hooking with the pegs (5) is established by the shapes thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/24 (2006.01); B65D 6/00 (2006.01); B65D 6/26 (2006.01); B65D 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/34 (2013.01); B65D 9/02 (2013.01); B65D 9/12 (2013.01); B65D 9/22 (2013.01); B65D 9/24 (2013.01); B65D 9/32 (2013.01); B65D 11/1873 (2013.01); B65D 11/26 (2013.01); B65D 21/0215 (2013.01); B65D 85/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2110334 A1 20091021; EP 2110334 A4 20130911; AR 063989 A1 20090304; ES 2301405 A1 20080616; ES 2301405 B1 20090501; ES 2316299 A1 20090401; ES 2316299 B1 20100122; WO 2008071813 A1 20080619

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150707

2013-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130826

2013-09-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130814

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 6/00 20060101ALI20130808BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 6/24 20060101AFI20130808BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 6/26 20060101ALI20130808BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 8/00 20060101ALI20130808BHEP

2010-03-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR