Global Patent Index - EP 2116375 A3

EP 2116375 A3 2010-02-24 - Web-fed printing press

Title (en)

Web-fed printing press

Title (de)

Rollendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Presse rotative

Publication

EP 2116375 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 09159515 A

Priority

DE 102008022635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2116375A2] The press has transfer system (11) attached to a transfer cylinder (10). The transfer system comprises rubber sleeves (13, 14) positioned in an axial direction on a transfer cylinder and/or a printing form system comprises form sleeves positioned in the axial direction on a form cylinder. The transfer cylinder and/or the form cylinder comprise three independent compressed air systems (19-21) in order to mount the rubber sleeves and/or the form sleeves on the respective transfer cylinder and/or the form cylinder, and to dismount the sleeves from the respective cylinders.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/193 (2006.01); B41F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/10 (2013.01); B41F 13/193 (2013.01); B41F 27/105 (2013.01); B41F 30/02 (2013.01); B41F 30/04 (2013.01); B41P 2227/11 (2013.01); B41P 2227/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2116375 A2 20091111; EP 2116375 A3 20100224; DE 102008022635 A1 20091112; US 2009277350 A1 20091112

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140311

2013-11-27 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-04-04 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100824

2010-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100723

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/10 20060101AFI20090908BHEP

2010-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/193 20060101ALI20100120BHEP

2010-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 27/10 20060101ALI20100120BHEP

2009-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR