Global Patent Index - EP 2132650 A4

EP 2132650 A4 2010-10-27 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITH A VIRTUAL WORLD

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITH A VIRTUAL WORLD

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINER VIRTUELLEN WELT

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMUNIQUER AVEC UN MONDE VIRTUEL

Publication

EP 2132650 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 08730776 A

Priority

  • US 2008055037 W
  • GB 0703974 A
  • US 89239707 P
  • GB 0704235 A
  • GB 0704227 A
  • GB 0704246 A
  • GB 0704225 A
  • US 68228107 A
  • US 68228407 A
  • US 68228707 A
  • US 68229207 A
  • US 68229807 A
  • US 68229907 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008108965A1] Methods and systems for executing a network application is provided. The network application is defined to render a virtual environment, and the virtual environment is depicted by computer graphics. The method includes generating an animated user and controlling the animated user in the virtual environment. The method presents advertising objects in the virtual environment and detects actions by the animated user to determine if the animated user is viewing one of the advertising object in the virtual environment. Reactions of the animated user are captured when the animated user is viewing the advertising object. The reactions by the animated user within the virtual environment are those that relate to the advertising object, and are presented to a third party to determine effectiveness of the advertising object in the virtual environment. Additionally, actual reactions (e.g., physical, audible, or combinations) of the real-world user can be captured and analyzed, or captured and mapped to the avatar for analysis of the of the avatar response.

IPC 8 full level

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/12 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC

A63F 13/00 (2013.01); A63F 13/12 (2013.01); G06Q 30/00 (2013.01); H04L 67/38 (2013.01); A63F 13/23 (2014.09); A63F 13/61 (2014.09); A63F 13/795 (2014.09); A63F 2300/105 (2013.01); A63F 2300/1081 (2013.01); A63F 2300/1087 (2013.01); A63F 2300/308 (2013.01); A63F 2300/406 (2013.01); A63F 2300/407 (2013.01); A63F 2300/5506 (2013.01); A63F 2300/6072 (2013.01); A63F 2300/807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 1216733 A2 20020626 - ARUZE CO LTD [JP]
  • [Y] WO 0242921 A1 20020530 - BUTTERFLY NET INC [US]
  • [A] WO 0070557 A2 20001123 - GRAPHIC GEMS [US]
  • [A] WO 2006056231 A1 20060601 - NOKIA CORP [FI], et al
  • [Y] BASET S A ET AL: "An Analysis of the Skype Peer-to-Peer Internet Telephony Protocol", INFOCOM 2006. 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICA TIONS. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, PI LNKD- DOI:10.1109/INFOCOM.2006.312, 1 April 2006 (2006-04-01), pages 1 - 11, XP031072352, ISBN: 978-1-4244-0221-2
  • [A] RICHARD A BARTLE: "Designing Virtual Worlds", 19000101, 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002478211
  • See also references of WO 2008109299A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family

WO 2008108965 A1 20080912; EP 2118757 A1 20091118; EP 2118757 A4 20101103; EP 2118840 A1 20091118; EP 2118840 A4 20101110; EP 2126708 A1 20091202; EP 2126708 A4 20101117; EP 2132650 A2 20091216; EP 2132650 A4 20101027; JP 2010533006 A 20101021; JP 2010535362 A 20101118; JP 2010535363 A 20101118; JP 2010535364 A 20101118; JP 2014149836 A 20140821; JP 5756198 B2 20150729