Global Patent Index - EP 2145967 A3

EP 2145967 A3 20100421 - Titanium aluminide alloys

Title (en)

Titanium aluminide alloys

Title (de)

Titanaluminidlegierungen

Title (fr)

Alliages d'aluminure de titane

Publication

EP 2145967 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 09010152 A

Priority

  • EP 08020431 A
  • DE 102007060587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2075349A2] Alloy based on titanium aluminides has the composition: Ti - (38-42 at.%) Al - (5-10 at.%) Nb. The composition has composite lamellae structures with B19-phase and beta -phase in each lamella. The ratio, especially the volume ratio, of the B19-phase and the beta -phase in each lamella is 0.05-20, especially 0.1-10. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) Method for the production of the alloy; and (2) Component made from the alloy.

IPC 8 full level

C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

C22C 1/02 (2013.01 - US); C22C 1/04 (2013.01 - US); C22C 1/0458 (2013.01 - US); C22C 1/0491 (2013.01 - EP); C22C 14/00 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 30/00 (2013.01 - US); C22F 1/183 (2013.01 - EP)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] JP H0578769 A 19930330 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [A] JP H05320791 A 19931203 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [X] JP H06116691 A 19940426 - MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP
  • [A] US 5746846 A 19980505 - KIM YOUNG-WON [US], et al
  • [A] JP H1161298 A 19990305 - NAT RES INST METALS
  • [A] JP H08120372 A 19960514 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [A] JP H06346173 A 19941220 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [A] JP 2000199025 A 20000718 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [A] JP H08199264 A 19960806 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD
  • [X] DE 102004056582 A1 20060601 - GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE]
  • [XP] EP 1889939 A2 20080220 - ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]
  • [A] CN 101011705 A 20070808 - HARBIN INST OF TECHNOLOGY [CN]
  • [A] CN 1069775 A 19930310 - UNIV BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH [CN]
  • [A] US 5296056 A 19940322 - JAIN SUSHIL K [US], et al
  • [X] APPEL, FRITZ ET AL: "Nano -scale design of TiAl alloys based on beta-phase decomposition", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS , 980, 383-388 CODEN: MRSPDH; ISSN: 0272-9172, 2007, XP009115409
  • [X] APPEL, FRITZ ET AL: "Nano -scale design of TiAl alloys based on .beta.-phase decomposition", ADVANCED ENGINEERING MATERIALS , 8(5), 371-376 CODEN: AENMFY; ISSN: 1438-1656, 2006, XP002523822
  • [X] APPEL, FRITZ ET AL: "Atomistic processes of phase transformation and dynamic recrystallization during hot-working of intermetallic titanium aluminides", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM , 558-559(PT. 1, RECRYSTALLIZATION AND GRAIN GROWTH III), 465-470 CODEN: MSFOEP; ISSN: 0255-5476, 2007, pages 465 - 470, XP009115410
  • [T] APPEL F ET AL: "A novel in situ composite structure in TiAl alloys", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS:PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 493, no. 1-2, 15 October 2008 (2008-10-15), pages 232 - 236, XP024100346, ISSN: 0921-5093, [retrieved on 20071214]
  • [A] APPEL F. ET AL.: "Recent Progress in the Development of Gamma Titanium Aluminide Alloys", ADVANCED ENGINEERING MATERIALS, vol. 2, no. 11, 2000, pages 699 - 720, XP002523946
  • [A] FIGGE U ET AL: "The effect of chromium, niobium and yttrium additions on the growth phenomena of oxide scales on titanium aluminide (TiAl)-based intermetallic compounds", EUROCORR. EUROPEAN CORROSION MEETING,, vol. 1/12th Meeting, 31 May 1992 (1992-05-31), pages 591 - 599, XP009129912
  • [A] ZHANG NING ET AL: "Influence of W, B and Y elements on antioxidation of high temperature and long term for TiAl based alloys with high Nb content", XIYOU JINSHU CAILIAO YU GONGCHENG - RARE METAL MATERIALS ANDENGINEERING, XIBEI YOUSE JINSHU YANJIUYUAN, BAOJI, CN, vol. 36, no. 5, 1 January 2007 (2007-01-01), pages 884 - 887, XP009129913, ISSN: 1002-185X
  • [A] CHEN YU-YONG ET AL: "Microstructure and interface reaction of investment casting TiAl alloys", TRANSACTIONS OF NONFERROUS METALS SOCIETY OF CHINA, CENTRAL SOUTH UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY, CHANGSHA, CN, vol. 16, no. 3, 1 January 2006 (2006-01-01), pages 1910 - 1914, XP009129914, ISSN: 1003-6326
  • [A] APPEL F ET AL: "Creep behavior of TiAl alloys with enhanced high-temperature capability", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS A, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, vol. 34, no. 10, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 2149 - 2164, XP019694532, ISSN: 1543-1940
  • [X] ZHANG L C ET AL: "Twin thickness dependence of type-I twin intersections in a .gamma.-TiAl-based Ti-45Al-8Nb-2.5Mn alloy deformed at room temperature", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, vol. 19, no. 19, 1 October 2000 (2000-10-01), pages 1727 - 1730, XP009129920, ISSN: 0261-8028
  • [X] CHEN G L ET AL: "Deformation mechanism at large strains in a high-Nb-containing TiAl at room temperature", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS:PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, 1 June 2002 (2002-06-01), pages A329 - A331, XP009129927, ISSN: 0921-5093
  • [X] ZHANG L C ET AL: "Twin-intersection-related nanotwinning in a heavily deformed .gamma.-TiAl-based alloy", PHILOSOPHICAL MAGAZINE LETTERS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, vol. 79, no. 2, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 49 - 54, XP009129928, ISSN: 0950-0839
  • [X] ZHANG L C ET AL: "Structural change of deformation twin boundaries in a heavily deformed gamma-TiAl-based alloy", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 45, no. 6, 1 October 2000 (2000-10-01), pages 320 - 325, XP004256576, ISSN: 0167-577X
  • [A] TETSUI TOSHIMITSU: "Heat-resistant cast gamma-TiAl alloy with high niobium addition for passenger vehicle turbochargers", NIOBIUM : HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS ; PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON NIOBIUM FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS, ARAXA, MG, BRASIL, DECEMBER 1 - 3, 2003, TMS, US, 1 January 2004 (2004-01-01), pages 205 - 213, XP009129923, ISBN: 978-0-87339-575-5
  • [A] TETSUI TOSHIMITSU ET AL: "Heat-resistant cast TiAl alloy for passenger vehicle turbochargers", MITSUBISHI JUKO GIHO,, vol. 38, no. 5, 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 238 - 241, XP009129932
  • [X] CHENG T T ET AL: "Effects of major alloying additions on the microstructure and mechanical properties of gamma-TiAl", INTERMETALLICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 7, no. 1, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 89 - 99, XP004143846, ISSN: 0966-9795
  • [A] PENG JI-HUA ET AL: "Tensile properties and fracture behavior of Ti2AlNb based alloys at room temperature", TRANSACTIONS OF NONFERROUS METALS SOCIETY OF CHINA, CENTRAL SOUTH UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY, CHANGSHA, CN, vol. 10, no. 3, 1 January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages 378 - 381, XP009129925, ISSN: 1003-6326
  • [A] JOHN C WOO ET AL: "Oxidation behavior and transmission electron microscope characterization of Ti-44Al-x Nb-2(Ta,Zr) alloys", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS A, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, vol. 34, no. 10, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 2263 - 2271, XP019694545, ISSN: 1543-1940
  • [A] WOO J C ET AL: "Effect of Ta and Zr additions on the oxidation characteristics of Ti-44Al-xNb alloys", GAMMA TITANIUM ALUMINIDES 2003,, 1 January 2003 (2003-01-01), pages 585 - 589, XP009129918
  • [X] KOBAYASHI SATORU ET AL: "Formation of .beta.-Ti phase in multi-component gamma alloys", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, US, vol. 753, 1 January 2003 (2003-01-01), pages 123 - 128, XP009129929, ISSN: 0272-9172
  • [X] HU ET AL: "On the massive phase transformation regime in TiAl alloys: The alloying effect on massive/lamellar competition", INTERMETALLICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 15, no. 3, 9 December 2006 (2006-12-09), pages 327 - 332, XP005882072, ISSN: 0966-9795
  • [A] MARTIN P L ET AL: "Thermomechanical processing effects on microstructure in alloys based on .gamma.-TiAl", STRUCTURAL INTERMETALLICS : ISSI ; PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON STRUCTURAL INTERMETALLICS ; HELD SEPTEMBER 26 - 30, 1993 AT SEVEN SPRINGS MOUNTAIN RESORT, CHAMPION, PENNSYLVANIA, MINERAL, METALS & MATERIALS SOCIETY, US, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 177 - 186, XP009129933, ISBN: 978-0-87339-253-2
  • [A] PATHER R ET AL: "Thermo-mechanical processing of high niobium .gamma.-TiAl alloys: Microstructure and mechanical properties", STRUCTURAL INTERMETALLICS 2001, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON STRUCTURAL INTERMETALLICS, 3RD, JACKSON HOLE, WY, UNITED STATES,, 23 September 2001 (2001-09-23), pages 207 - 215, XP009129934
  • [A] HUANG Z W ET AL: "The effects of long-term air exposure on the stability of lamellar TiAl alloys", INTERMETALLICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 8, no. 4, 1 April 2000 (2000-04-01), pages 417 - 426, XP004191091, ISSN: 0966-9795

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 2075349 A2 20090701; EP 2075349 A3 20090909; EP 2075349 B1 20160309; BR PI0806979 A2 20100420; CA 2645843 A1 20090613; CN 101457314 A 20090617; CN 101457314 B 20130724; DE 102007060587 A1 20090618; DE 102007060587 B4 20130131; EP 2145967 A2 20100120; EP 2145967 A3 20100421; EP 2145967 B1 20130724; EP 2423341 A1 20120229; EP 2423341 B1 20130710; IL 195756 D0 20091118; JP 2009144247 A 20090702; JP 5512964 B2 20140604; KR 20090063173 A 20090617; RU 2008149177 A 20100620; RU 2466201 C2 20121110; US 2009151822 A1 20090618; US 2010000635 A1 20100107; US 2014010701 A1 20140109

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 08020431 A 20081125; BR PI0806979 A 20081211; CA 2645843 A 20081204; CN 200810172769 A 20081212; DE 102007060587 A 20071213; EP 09010152 A 20081125; EP 11187502 A 20081125; IL 19575608 A 20081207; JP 2008318555 A 20081215; KR 20080126803 A 20081212; RU 2008149177 A 20081212; US 201313931051 A 20130628; US 33190908 A 20081210; US 51245109 A 20090730