Global Patent Index - EP 2148831 A1

EP 2148831 A1 2010-02-03 - CONTROL DEVICE, SORTING SYSTEM AND SORTING METHOD FOR GOODS

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE, SORTING SYSTEM AND SORTING METHOD FOR GOODS

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG, SORTIERANLAGE SOWIE SORTIERVERFAHREN FÜR GÜTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME DE TRIAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRIAGE DE MARCHANDISES

Publication

EP 2148831 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08759764 A

Priority

  • EP 2008056148 W
  • DE 102007025553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008145559A1] The invention relates to a control device for controlling a sorting system for goods (1), wherein the sorting system comprises control means (4a, 4b, 7a, 7b, T1, T2, T3, 6a, 6b), based on which goods can be conveyed in goods carriers, wherein the control device comprises a measuring device (3, 3a, 3b), with which the dimensions of goods (1) and goods carriers (2) controlled by the control means can be detected, and an evaluation, which compares the detected dimensions to each other such that at least one product is associated with a goods carrier, the carrying surface of which can be covered by the at least one product as fully as possible, wherein the control device comprises communication means, which select the control means as a function of the association of a goods carrier such that the at least one product is fed to the goods carrier associated therewith.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 43/08 (2006.01); B65G 47/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 43/08 (2013.01); B65G 47/52 (2013.01); B65G 2201/0258 (2013.01); B65G 2203/0208 (2013.01); B65G 2203/041 (2013.01); B65G 2203/044 (2013.01); B65G 2207/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008145559A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102007025553 A1 20081204; EP 2148831 A1 20100203; WO 2008145559 A1 20081204

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2011-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110711

2010-09-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS