Global Patent Index - EP 2148960 A2

EP 2148960 A2 2010-02-03 - TOILET BOWL CLEANING AND/OR DEODORIZING DEVICE

Title (en)

TOILET BOWL CLEANING AND/OR DEODORIZING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG ODER DESODORIERUNG EINER TOILETTENSCHÜSSEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER ET/OU DÉSODORISER DES CUVETTES DE WC

Publication

EP 2148960 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08767531 A

Priority

  • US 2008005716 W
  • US 80049307 A
  • US 80050107 A
  • US 80048807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008137044A1] A rotary sprayer and method for spraying an inner surface of an enclusure, such as a toilet bowl, with a fluid are disclosed. The rotary sprayer includes a clip (110) and a rotating nozzle (120). The clip (110) includes a fluid inlet (208) and an arm (176) having a distal end section (178). The nozzle includes a circular deflection plate, and a pair of spaced apart walls extending away from a surface of the deflection plate.The walls define a channel on the surface of the deflection plate. A passageway is in fluid communication with the channel and an end space between the walls. The fluid inlet is positioned in the end space and a spindle of the nozzle is mounted to the distal end section of the arm. Fluid exiting the fluid inlet flows through the passageway andt he channel and contacts an inner suface of at least,one ot the walls to rotate the nozzle and spray the inner suface walll of the enclusure with the fluid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01); B05B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01); B05B 3/0486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008137100A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008137044 A1 20081113; AU 2008248181 A1 20081113; AU 2008248181 B2 20130228; AU 2008248218 A1 20081113; EP 2148960 A2 20100203; EP 2150656 A1 20100210; JP 2010525947 A 20100729; JP 2010530037 A 20100902; JP 5385898 B2 20140108; JP 5404611 B2 20140205; WO 2008137100 A2 20081113; WO 2008137100 A3 20081231

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-08-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130419

2012-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2010-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS