Global Patent Index - EP 2150140 A2

EP 2150140 A2 2010-02-10 - PATTERNED WRAPPER PAPER WITH AN ANTI-WRINKLING AGENT

Title (en)

PATTERNED WRAPPER PAPER WITH AN ANTI-WRINKLING AGENT

Title (de)

STRUKTURIERTES WICKELPAPIER MIT EINEM ANTIKNITTERUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

PAPIER D'EMBALLAGE À MOTIFS AVEC AGENT ANTI-PLISSEMENT

Publication

EP 2150140 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08807083 A

Priority

  • IB 2008002399 W
  • US 92466607 P
  • US 92467607 P
  • US 92482507 P
  • US 92945207 P
  • US 93575107 P
  • US 6443808 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2009004482A2] Wrapper paper (23) for cigarette manufacture includes transversely extending band regions (26) applied by a printing technique, such as gravure printing. The band regions (26) comprise starch, an anti-wrinkling agent, and optionally calcium carbonate. The anti-wrinkling agent may be selected from the group consisting of 1,2 propylene glycol and glycerin.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/025 (2013.01); D21H 21/14 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2009004482A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2009004482 A2 20090108; WO 2009004482 A3 20090219; AU 2008272618 A1 20090108; AU 2008272618 B2 20130516; BR PI0811774 A2 20141111; CA 2688157 A1 20090108; CA 2688157 C 20150512; CN 101677628 A 20100324; EP 2150140 A2 20100210; IL 201539 D0 20100531; JP 2010527601 A 20100819; JP 5334959 B2 20131106; KR 20100020958 A 20100223; MX 2009012622 A 20091211; NZ 580551 A 20120831

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-02-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140123

2012-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2011-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110328

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091211

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS