EP 2150243 A4 20130821 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ACTIVE AGENT ABSORPTION
Title (en)
COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ACTIVE AGENT ABSORPTION
Title (de)
ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERSTÄRKTE WIRKSTOFFABSORPTION
Title (fr)
COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'ABSORPTION D'AGENTS ACTIFS
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2008064233 W 20080520
- US 80520207 A 20070521
- US 409907 P 20071121
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2008144690A2] Compositions and methods for enhancing the absorption of active agents across the mucosa of animal subjects are provided. Compositions having biodegradable linkages are included, conferring decreased likelihood of toxicity. Methods of use and appropriate dosage forms are also provided.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/715 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/18 (2013.01); A61K 9/0031 (2013.01); A61K 9/0034 (2013.01); A61K 9/0043 (2013.01); A61K 9/006 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] US 5773647 A 19980630 - LEONE-BAY ANDREA [US], et al
- [Y] XUAN DING ET AL: "Oral Absorption Enhancement of Cromolyn Sodium Through Noncovalent Complexation", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, vol. 21, no. 12, 1 December 2004 (2004-12-01), pages 2196 - 2206, XP019370659, ISSN: 1573-904X, DOI: 10.1007/S11095-004-7671-9
- [Y] NAITO MASUKAZU ET AL: "Chemotherapeutics for Mycobacterium tuberculosis. XII. Antibacterial activity of derivatives of esters of p-aminosalicylic acid on Mycobacterium tuberculosis", YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, vol. 78, no. 6, 1 January 1958 (1958-01-01), pages 682 - 683, XP008115756, ISSN: 0031-6903
- [Y] FAUST JOHN A ET AL: "Derivatives of salicylamide", AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION. JOURNAL, AMERICAN PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION, US, vol. 45, no. 8, 20 February 1956 (1956-02-20), pages 514 - 517, XP008115755, ISSN: 0003-0465, [retrieved on 20060923], DOI: 10.1002/JPS.3030450803
- See references of WO 2008144690A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2008144690 A2 20081127; WO 2008144690 A3 20090226; EP 2150243 A2 20100210; EP 2150243 A4 20130821
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2008064233 W 20080520; EP 08755962 A 20080520