Global Patent Index - EP 2150284 A2

EP 2150284 A2 2010-02-10 - TISSUE ENGINEERING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR LUMINAL ORGANS

Title (en)

TISSUE ENGINEERING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR LUMINAL ORGANS

Title (de)

GEWEBEZÜCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN FÜR LUMINALE ORGANE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE MANIPULATION DE TISSUS POUR ORGANES À LUMIÈRE

Publication

EP 2150284 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08769154 A

Priority

  • US 2008061132 W
  • US 90799407 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008134305A2] Tissue engineering devices and methods are provided for the reconstruction, repair, augmentation, or replacement of a luminal organ or tissue structure involving the use of a biodegradable polymer matrix conforming to a portion of a laminarly arranged luminal organ, the processing of autologous, allogeneic or xenogeneic tissue comprising multiple cell populations to obtain a minced tissue composition, the seeding of the matrix with the composition, and the implanting of the seeded polymer matrix into a patient.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/3604 (2013.01); A61L 27/3679 (2013.01); A61L 27/3683 (2013.01); A61L 27/3834 (2013.01); A61L 27/3882 (2013.01); A61L 2430/22 (2013.01); A61L 2430/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008134305A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008134305 A2 20081106; WO 2008134305 A3 20090903; CA 2685048 A1 20081106; CN 101687063 A 20100331; EP 2150284 A2 20100210; JP 2010524644 A 20100722

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-02 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131031

2010-08-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100408

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS