Global Patent Index - EP 2150457 A1

EP 2150457 A1 2010-02-10 - CONTROLLABLE VEHICLE SUSPENSION SYSTEM WITH MAGNETO-RHEOLOGICAL FLUID DEVICE

Title (en)

CONTROLLABLE VEHICLE SUSPENSION SYSTEM WITH MAGNETO-RHEOLOGICAL FLUID DEVICE

Title (de)

STEUERBARES FAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM MIT MAGNETORHEOLOGISCHER FLUIDVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION DE VÉHICULE COMMANDABLE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF À FLUIDE MAGNÉTORHÉOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 2150457 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07844940 A

Priority

  • US 2007083937 W
  • US 74291107 A
  • US 98421207 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008133720A1] A controllable suspension system for controlling the relative motion between a first body (22) and a second body (24) includes at least one strut (30) including a magneto-rheological fluid damper (32,200). The fluid damper (32,200) includes a piston rod guide (206) disposed within a damper body (202). The piston rod guide (206) has a passage (212) therein for receiving a piston rod (52,214). A piston rod bearing assembly (54,232) is disposed in the piston rod guide (206) to engage with and support reciprocal motion of the piston rod (52,214). At least a first piston rod seal (224) and at least a second piston rod seal (228) are arranged to seal between the piston rod guide (206) and the piston rod (52,214). A fluid chamber (234) is defined between the piston rod guide (206) and the piston rod (52,214). A piston rod guide (206) gas charged accumulator (244,272) is arranged between the piston rod (52,214) and the damper body (202).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 33/06 (2006.01); F16F 9/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 33/0608 (2013.01); B60G 17/06 (2013.01); B60G 99/008 (2013.01); F16F 9/535 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008133720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008133720 A1 20081106; CA 2685908 A1 20081106; EP 2150457 A1 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2010-08-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100415

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ST. CLAIR, KENNETH A.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCMAHON, WILLIAM J.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARJORAM, ROBERT H.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HILDEBRAND, STEVE F.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IVERS, DOUGLAS E.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ERICKSEN, GREGORY S.

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS