Global Patent Index - EP 2150631 A2

EP 2150631 A2 2010-02-10 - METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE NUMBER OF PHASES OF A PTA1-LAYER OF A GAS TURBINE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SINGLE-PHASE PTA1-LAYER ON A GAS TURBINE COMPONENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE NUMBER OF PHASES OF A PTA1-LAYER OF A GAS TURBINE COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SINGLE-PHASE PTA1-LAYER ON A GAS TURBINE COMPONENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN DER ANZAHL DER PHASEN EINER PtAl-SCHICHT EINES GASTURBINENBAUTEILS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER EINPHASIGEN PTAl-SHICHT AN EINEM GASTURBINENBAUTEIL

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉFINIR LE NOMBRE DE PHASES D'UNE COUCHE DE PtAl D'UN COMPOSANT DE TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COUCHE DE PtAl À PHASE UNIQUE SUR UN COMPOSANT DE TURBINE À GAZ

Publication

EP 2150631 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08773258 A

Priority

  • DE 2008000839 W
  • DE 102007025697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008145093A2] The invention relates to a method for adjusting the number of phases of a PtA1-layer of a component of an aircraft engine when producing said type of layer during production or reconditioning of said type of component of an aircraft engine. The following steps are carried out in order to produce a single-phase PtA1-layer on a gas turbine component: a Pt-layer is placed on the gas turbine component, the thickness thereof being less than 4 µm; homogenisation such that the Pt in the base material of the gas turbine component is diffused; and aluminised and controlled such that a A1-content, that is smaller than or equal to 23 % in weight, is adjusted; and the following steps are carried out in order to produce a two-phase PtA1-layer on the gas turbine component; a Pt-layer is placed on the gas turbine component, the thickness thereof being in the region of 5 µm - 8 µm; homogenisation such that the Pt in the base material of the gas turbine component is diffused; and aluminised in order to produce the PtA1-layer. The invention also relates to a method for producing a single-phase PtA1-layer on a gas turbine component.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/02 (2006.01); C23C 10/16 (2006.01); C23C 10/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/08 (2013.01); C23C 10/02 (2013.01); C23C 10/16 (2013.01); C23C 10/58 (2013.01); C23C 10/60 (2013.01); C23C 30/00 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008145093A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102007025697 A1 20081204; EP 2150631 A2 20100210; US 2010183811 A1 20100722; WO 2008145093 A2 20081204; WO 2008145093 A3 20090430

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES AG

2014-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2012-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100607

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS