Global Patent Index - EP 2150636 A1

EP 2150636 A1 2010-02-10 - POLYMER-BASED CERAMIC COATING TO PROTECT SURFACES OF FLUORIDE IONS DURING A CLEANING PROCESS

Title (en)

POLYMER-BASED CERAMIC COATING TO PROTECT SURFACES OF FLUORIDE IONS DURING A CLEANING PROCESS

Title (de)

POLYMERBASIERTE KERAMIKBESCHICHTUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON OBERFLÄCHEN VOR FLUORIDIONEN BEI EINEM REINIGUNGSPROZESS

Title (fr)

COUCHES DE CÉRAMIQUE À BASE DE POLYMÈRE DESTINÉES À LA PROTECTION DE SURFACES CONTRE LES IONS FLUORURE LORS D'UN PROCESSUS DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 2150636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08718280 A

Priority

  • EP 2008053654 W
  • EP 07008141 A
  • EP 08718280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1983075A1] Process for cleaning partially corroded or oxidized surface sections (9) with fluoride ions in which the uncorroded and non-oxidized surface sections are coated with a polymer based ceramic (4) prior to cleaning, and a ceramicized Si-containing precursor of the polymer based ceramic is applied before coating with the ceramic. The polymer based ceramic is an SiC- or Si3N4 forming ceramic.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23G 5/00 (2006.01); B08B 7/00 (2006.01); B23K 1/20 (2006.01); C04B 41/50 (2006.01); C23C 18/06 (2006.01); C23C 18/12 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 5/00 (2013.01); B23K 1/206 (2013.01); B23K 9/235 (2013.01); B23K 26/60 (2015.10); C23C 18/06 (2013.01); C23C 18/122 (2013.01); C23C 18/1275 (2013.01); C23C 18/1295 (2013.01); F01D 5/005 (2013.01); F01D 25/002 (2013.01); F05D 2230/90 (2013.01); F05D 2300/2261 (2013.01); F05D 2300/611 (2013.01); Y02T 50/67 (2013.01); Y02T 50/672 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008128848A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1983075 A1 20081022; EP 2150636 A1 20100210; US 2010129544 A1 20100527; WO 2008128848 A1 20081030

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-08-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2010-07-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS