Global Patent Index - EP 2150829 A1

EP 2150829 A1 2010-02-10 - MAGNET ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING AN NMR-COMPATIBLE HOMOGENEOUS PERMANENT MAGNETIC FIELD

Title (en)

MAGNET ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING AN NMR-COMPATIBLE HOMOGENEOUS PERMANENT MAGNETIC FIELD

Title (de)

MAGNETANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES NMR-FÄHIGEN HOMOGENEN PERMANENTMAGNETFELDES

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT D'AIMANTS DESTINÉS À CRÉER UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE PERMANENT HOMOGÈNE POUVANT ÊTRE UTILISÉ EN RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE NUCLÉAIRE

Publication

EP 2150829 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725713 A

Priority

EP 2007004832 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008145167A1] A magnet arrangement for generating an NMR-compatible homogeneous permanent magnetic field is described. The invention is distinguished by the fact that provision is made of two permanent magnets which are referred to as main magnets below and each have a magnet pole surface region, by the fact that the magnet pole surface regions are arranged parallel to one another and at a distance from one another, with the result that the main magnets delimit an interspace on both sides by means of their magnet surface regions, by the fact that the magnet pole surfaces of the main magnets each have opposite magnetic polarization, by the fact that provision is made of at least two annular permanent magnets which are referred to as ring magnets below, are arranged coaxially with respect to one another and together radially bound a space inside the ring, and by the fact that the ring magnets are arranged relative to the two main magnets in such a manner that the space inside the ring encloses at least regions of the interspace and the magnetic fields of the main and ring magnets are constructively superimposed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/383 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/383 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008145167A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008145167 A1 20081204; CA 2688836 A1 20081204; EP 2150829 A1 20100210; NO 20093406 A 20091217; US 2010231219 A1 20100916; US 8390289 B2 20130305

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2012-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120403

2010-09-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MANZ, BERTRAM DR.

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOLKE, FRANK DR.

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENECKE, MARTIN

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091217

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS