Global Patent Index - EP 2151031 A1

EP 2151031 A1 2010-02-10 - METHOD FOR OPERATION OF AN ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST ONE ENERGY DISTRIBUTION DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATION OF AN ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST ONE ENERGY DISTRIBUTION DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ANORDNUNG MIT ZUMINDEST EINER ENERGIEVERTEILEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'UN SYSTÈME COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF RÉPARTITEUR D'ÉNERGIE

Publication

EP 2151031 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07726023 A

Priority

EP 2007005259 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008148417A1] The invention relates, inter alia, to a method for the operation of an arrangement with at least one energy distribution device (20), a plurality of energy production devices (30, 30'), and an energy supply network (10) to which at least one energy distribution device and the plurality of energy generation devices are connected. The invention provides that the energy generation devices and the energy distribution device be connected directly or indirectly via a communications device (70), and that the energy distribution device determine time-dependent energy loss conditions (A) as a function of the network load of the energy supply network, and that the energy generation devices be monitored to determine which ones display energy delivery conditions (L) that agree with the corresponding energy loss conditions of the energy distribution device, and in the case of agreement, that the energy from the energy generation devices with corresponding energy delivery conditions be fed into the energy supply network.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02J 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02J 3/008 (2013.01); Y04S 50/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008148417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008148417 A1 20081211; EP 2151031 A1 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2016-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160510

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2010-09-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANDT, CHRISTIAN, PETER

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRIMMINGER, JOCHEN

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HECKEL, JUERGEN

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERN, CLAUS

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOUTHALL, ALAN

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WERNER, THOMAS

2010-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS