Global Patent Index - EP 2151531 A2

EP 2151531 A2 2010-02-10 - Heat isolating masonry block

Title (en)

Heat isolating masonry block

Title (de)

Wärmedämmender Mauerstein

Title (fr)

Bloc de maçonnerie pour isolation thermique

Publication

EP 2151531 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 09007736 A

Priority

DE 202008010803 U

Abstract (en)

The brick (1) has a heat insulating body limited by two bearing surfaces opposite to each other. Two individual coatings (5), of which one is firmly connected with one of the two bearing surfaces. Supporting parts run through the heat insulating body. The brick produces a heat uncoupling between a wall and floor and/or wall and ceiling and builds a brick-work. The supporting parts are designed as freely standing supporting column (4) and undetachably connected with the coatings. The coatings consist of a cement mortar and polymer mass.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein wärmedämmender Mauerstein (1) mit - einem durch zwei sich gegenüberliegende Auflageflächen begrenzten Wärmedämmkörper (2), - zwei einzelnen Beschichtungen (5), von denen jeweils eine mit einer der beiden Auflageflächen fest verbunden ist, - durch den Wärmedämmkörper (2) verlaufende Stützorgane, wobei die Stützorgane als frei stehende Tragsäulen (4) ausgebildet und mit den Beschichtungen (5) unlöslich verbunden sind. Ein solcher Mauerstein ist geeignet zur Herstellung einer Wärmeentkopplung zwischen Wand und Boden bzw. Wand und Decke als auch zum Bau von Mauerwerken.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/41 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0286 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202008010803 U1 20081009; EP 2151531 A2 20100210; EP 2151531 A3 20120822

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150804

2015-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150323

2013-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130222

2012-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS

2012-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04C 1/41 20060101AFI20120717BHEP

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS