Global Patent Index - EP 2152853 A1

EP 2152853 A1 2010-02-17 - IN VITRO MODEL OF LATENT MYCOBACTERIAL INFECTION

Title (en)

IN VITRO MODEL OF LATENT MYCOBACTERIAL INFECTION

Title (de)

IN-VITRO-MODELL EINER LATENTEN MYKOBAKTERIENINFEKTION

Title (fr)

MODÈLE IN VITRO D'INFECTION MYCOBACTÉRIENNE LATENTE

Publication

EP 2152853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08746514 A

Priority

  • US 2008061110 W
  • US 91483807 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008134298A1] A method of inducing latency in Mycobacterium permits preparation of an in vitro model system of latent mycobacterial infection. Latency is induced in a pure culture of Mycobacterium by exposing it to multiple stress conditions, including a low nutrient culture medium without glycerol, a low pH, a relatively high level of carbon dioxide and a relatively low gas phase oxygen level. An in vitro model of mycobacterial infection employs macrophages induced from THP1 cells which are then infected with Mycobacterium. The infected macrophages are grown under hypoxic conditions to induce latency in the mycobacteria. The in vitro model of infection is useful in evaluating compounds for activity against latent mycobacteria.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/12 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/36 (2013.01); C12N 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008134298 A1 20081106; AU 2008245901 A1 20081106; AU 2008245901 B2 20141016; CA 2685746 A1 20081103; CA 2685746 C 20170228; EP 2152853 A1 20100217; EP 2152853 A4 20100616; US 2009023596 A1 20090122; US 2011033914 A1 20110210; US 2011033915 A1 20110210; US 2013040829 A1 20130214; US 8012492 B2 20110906; US 8211446 B2 20120703; US 8241644 B2 20120814; US 8551499 B2 20131008

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160921

2014-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140728

2010-08-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-06-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100517

2010-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS