Global Patent Index - EP 2153746 A2

EP 2153746 A2 2010-02-17 - Washing brush

Title (en)

Washing brush

Title (de)

Waschbürste

Title (fr)

Brosse de nettoyage

Publication

EP 2153746 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 09165189 A

Priority

DE 102008039804 A

Abstract (en)

The brush has a delivery device (37) including rotor arms (42, 43) that are rotatably supported at a rotating axis (39) and supporting nozzles (44, 45) that rotate at the rotating axis during impingement with cleaning liquid i.e. water, staying under pressure together with the rotor arms. The liquid is delivered to an object that is to be cleaned, by a supporting ring (28). A set of cleaning brushes (25) are supported at the object by the supporting ring. The supporting ring is formed by the cleaning brushes that are arranged offset to one another in radial- and circumferential directions. A lower part (16) of a housing (12) has an abutment edge in the circumferential direction that is made of rubber-elastic material or thermoplastic elastomer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Waschbürste zum Reinigen eines Gegenstandes, mit einem Gehäuse (12), dem unter Druck stehende Reinigungsflüssigkeit zuführbar ist und von dessen Unterseite Reinigungsborsten (25) abstehen und das eine Abgabeeinrichtung (37) für die Reinigungsflüssigkeit aufnimmt. Um die Waschbürste derart weiterzubilden, dass eine verbesserte Reinigungswirkung erzielt werden kann, ohne dass die Gefahr besteht, dass der zu reinigende Gegenstand von der Waschbürste beschädigt wird, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass die Abgabeeinrichtung (37) zumindest einen Rotorarm (42, 43) aufweist, der um eine Drehachse (39) frei drehbar gelagert ist und eine Düse (44, 45) trägt, die bei Beaufschlagung mit unter Druck stehender Reinigungsflüssigkeit zusammen mit dem Rotorarm (42, 43) um die Drehachse (39) umläuft und die Reinigungsflüssigkeit durch einen von den Reinigungsborsten (25) gebildeten Stützring (28) hindurch auf den zu reinigenden Gegenstand abgibt, wobei die Waschbürste (10) mittels des Stützringes (28) am zu reinigenden Gegenstand abstützbar ist und der Stützring (28) von einer Vielzahl von in radialer Richtung und in Umfangsrichtung versetzt zueinander angeordneten Reinigungsborsten (25) gebildet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 11/06 (2006.01); A46B 5/00 (2006.01); A46B 13/00 (2006.01); A46B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/06 (2013.01); A46B 5/0095 (2013.01); A46B 13/008 (2013.01); A46B 2200/3046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2153746 A2 20100217; EP 2153746 A3 20131009; DE 102008039804 A1 20100218

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-06-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160519

2014-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2013-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2013-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 13/06 20060101ALI20130902BHEP

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 11/06 20060101AFI20130902BHEP

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 5/00 20060101ALI20130902BHEP

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 13/00 20060101ALI20130902BHEP

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2010-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS