Global Patent Index - EP 2154004 A1

EP 2154004 A1 2010-02-17 - ADHERING METHOD OF WIDE BREADTH WALL CLOTH

Title (en)

ADHERING METHOD OF WIDE BREADTH WALL CLOTH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANKLEBEN VON WANDBEHÄNGEN GROSSER BREITE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'ADHÉRENCE D'UN TISSU À LARGE LAIZE APPLIQUÉ SUR UN MUR

Publication

EP 2154004 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07721274 A

Priority

CN 2007001701 W

Abstract (en)

An adhering method of a wide breadth wall cloth includes the steps of treating the wall surface, adhering a substrate wall cloth and/or a surface wall cloth. The surface wall cloth is of wide breadth, with its breadth greater than 1.2 m and less than 6.5 m. The step of adhering surface wall cloth involves cutting out a surface wall cloth with the same size to the wall to which it is to be adhered, with a hot-melt adhesive preliminarily coated on or not, and adhering the surface wall cloth to the substrate wall cloth or wall surface in the condition of being heated and pressurized. The substrate wall cloth is adhered by a traditional gluing process.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 7/00 (2006.01); B44C 7/06 (2006.01); E04F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/002 (2013.01); B44C 7/022 (2013.01); B44C 7/025 (2013.01); B44C 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2154004 A1 20100217; EP 2154004 A4 20120404; US 2010096064 A1 20100422; WO 2008144954 A1 20081204

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121006

2012-04-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 7/00 20060101AFI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 7/06 20060101ALI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 13/00 20060101ALI20120301BHEP

2010-09-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-03-17 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-03-03 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2010-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS