Global Patent Index - EP 2155031 A1

EP 2155031 A1 2010-02-24 - THREE PART TUBE

Title (en)

THREE PART TUBE

Title (de)

DREITEILIGES ROHR

Title (fr)

TUYAU EN TROIS PARTIES

Publication

EP 2155031 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08741858 A

Priority

  • SE 2008000284 W
  • SE 0701108 A
  • US 93836707 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008136724A1] This invention relates to a telescopic tube for a vacuum cleaner, comprising a first inner tube, a second inner tube, and an outer tube, wherein the first and second inner tubes are arranged to form a first and second telescopic link relative to a first and a second end portion of the outer tube, respectively. The outer tube forms the intermediate tube of the three-part tube while at the same time being fully accessible in any position, whereby one common grip for operating both of the two respective telescopic links, formed by the first and second inner tubes and the intermediate outer tube, of the three part telescopic tube is obtained.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/24 (2006.01); F16B 7/14 (2006.01); F16L 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008136724 A1 20081113; CN 101677728 A 20100324; CN 101677728 B 20130116; EP 2155031 A1 20100224; EP 2155031 A4 20101201; SE 0701108 L 20081108; SE 531274 C2 20090210; US 2010306960 A1 20101209

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140513

2014-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140102

2010-12-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-08-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS