Global Patent Index - EP 2155392 A2

EP 2155392 A2 2010-02-24 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS ZUR SELEKTIVEN HYDRIERUNG ACETYLENISCHER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGÉNATION SÉLECTIVE D'HYDROCARBURES ACÉTYLÉNIQUES

Publication

EP 2155392 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08758898 A

Priority

  • EP 2008004327 W
  • DE 102007025315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008145387A2] The invention relates to a method for producing a catalyst, in particular for the selective reduction of acetylenic compounds in hydrocarbon streams. According to said method: an impregnating solution is provided, said solution containing a mixture of water and at least one organic solvent that is miscible with water as the solvent, in which at least one active metal compound and preferably at least one promoter metal compound is dissolved; a support is provided; the support is impregnated with the impregnating solution; the impregnated support is calcined. Palladium is preferred as the active metal and silver as the promoter metal. The invention also relates to a catalyst obtained according to the method and to the preferred use of said catalyst for the selective hydrogenation of acetylenic compounds.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 37/02 (2006.01); B01J 23/40 (2006.01); B01J 23/44 (2006.01); B01J 23/48 (2006.01); B01J 23/50 (2006.01); B01J 23/74 (2006.01); B01J 35/00 (2006.01); C07C 7/167 (2006.01); C10G 45/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/44 (2013.01); B01J 23/40 (2013.01); B01J 23/48 (2013.01); B01J 23/50 (2013.01); B01J 23/74 (2013.01); B01J 35/002 (2013.01); B01J 37/0203 (2013.01); C07C 7/167 (2013.01); C10G 45/40 (2013.01); B01J 35/006 (2013.01); B01J 35/008 (2013.01); B01J 35/1014 (2013.01); B01J 37/0221 (2013.01); B01J 37/16 (2013.01); C07C 2521/04 (2013.01); C07C 2523/44 (2013.01); C07C 2523/56 (2013.01); Y02P 20/52 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 7/167 + C07C 11/06
  2. C07C 7/167 + C07C 11/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008145387 A2 20081204; WO 2008145387 A3 20090312; CN 101730588 A 20100609; DE 102007025315 A1 20081211; EP 2155392 A2 20100224; JP 2010527776 A 20100819; JP 5323060 B2 20131023; KR 20100041714 A 20100422; RU 2009145197 A 20110710; TW 200916189 A 20090416; US 2010217052 A1 20100826

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140227

2013-11-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131016

2012-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-08-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUED-CHEMIE IP GMBH & CO. KG

2011-01-05 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101116

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNGAR, SYBILLE

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISCHER, RICHARD

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRAUTWEIN, ANDREAS

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLANKENSHIP, STEVE

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOYER, JENNIFER

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: URBANCIC, MICHAEL

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROKICKI, ANDRZEJ

2010-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS