Global Patent Index - EP 2155948 A2

EP 2155948 A2 2010-02-24 - LAUNDRY MACHINE

Title (en)

LAUNDRY MACHINE

Title (de)

WASCHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE POUR LA LESSIVE

Publication

EP 2155948 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08753547 A

Priority

  • KR 2008002751 W
  • KR 20070048096 A
  • KR 20070048097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008143436A2] A laundry machine capable of washing or drying laundry is disclosed. The disclosed laundry machine can achieve an enhancement in user convenience and a reduction in the manufacturing costs and weight of the laundry machine.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/12 (2006.01); D06F 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/12 (2013.01); D06F 29/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008143436 A2 20081127; WO 2008143436 A3 20101007; CN 101970745 A 20110209; CN 101970745 B 20121212; EP 2155948 A2 20100224; EP 2155948 A4 20140604; US 2009013730 A1 20090115

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171025

2016-11-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161024

2014-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/12 20060101AFI20140430BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 29/00 20060101ALI20140430BHEP

2011-09-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-11-10 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20101007

2010-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS