Global Patent Index - EP 2156019 A1

EP 2156019 A1 2010-02-24 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY FROM HEAT

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY FROM HEAT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STROMERZEUGUNG AUS WÄRME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COURANT À PARTIR DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 2156019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08773354 A

Priority

  • EP 2008004310 W
  • DE 102007027349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008151730A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for generating electricity from heat. Said device comprises a generator and a turbine that absorbs the dynamics of a moved medium, according to the preamble of claims 1 and 15. In order to do away with said mechanical drawbacks when the turbine and the generator are coupled to each other and be able to more effectively utilize power absorption and ultimately power conversion from the medium, the turbine (3) or the turbine wheel (11) and the generator (4) are arranged on a joint and/or jointly mounted shaft (A).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 15/10 (2006.01); H02K 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 25/10 (2013.01); F01D 15/10 (2013.01); F02C 7/32 (2013.01); F02C 7/36 (2013.01); F05D 2220/64 (2013.01); F05D 2220/766 (2013.01); F05D 2220/768 (2013.01); F05D 2240/51 (2013.01); F05D 2240/60 (2013.01); Y02E 20/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008151730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008151730 A1 20081218; DE 102007027349 A1 20081224; DE 102007027349 B4 20090205; DE 202007018628 U1 20090115; EP 2156019 A1 20100224

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150619

2013-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRI-O-GEN B.V.

2011-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110119

2010-09-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS